Ziplink, Inc. et al v. Ziplink, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ziplink, Inc., Zachs Family Limited Partnership Number One and Henry M Zachs
Defendant: Ziplink, Inc., D.R. Entertainment Investments, Inc., D.R. Entertainment Group, LLC, Standard Transfer & Trust Co. Inc., Dwight Chornomud, John Jarvis, Hossein Mahdavi and Robert Susnar
Case Number: 2:2008cv01670
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 83 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam. ORDERED that Standard Transfer & Trust Co. Inc. shall have its person most knowledgeable appear and be examined under oath at the law offices of Callister & Frizell, 8275 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 200, Las Vegas, Nevada 89123, on 10/4/11 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 8/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 85 replaced on 8/23/2011) (MMM).
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Zachs Family Limited Partnership Number One, Ziplink, Inc., Henry M Zachs against D.R. Entertainment Group, LLC, D.R. Entertainment Investments, Inc., Standard Transfer & Trust Co. Inc., Ziplink, Inc., Dwight Chornomud, John Jarvis, Robert Susnar. Plaintiffs' 78 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have and recover from the Defaulted Defendants, jointly and severally, actual damages in the sum of $91,654.72. Plaintiffs shall have and recover from the Defaulted Defendants, jointly and severally, reasonable and necessary attorney fees in the sum of $18,987.50. Plaintiffs shall have and recover from the Defaulted Defendants, jointly and severally, reasonable and necessary cour t costs in the sum of $2,114.14. Plaintiffs shall have and recover from the Defaulted Defendants, jointly and severally, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest as allowed by law. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDERED that, within 10 days of this order, Plaintiffs shall direct the court to the docket number corresponding to the Affidavit of Service for Susnar, file an Affidavit of Service for Susnar, or file a new proposed order not applicable to Susnar. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Regarding 72 Response to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 7/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Standard Transfer & Trust. Michael Morey withdrawn from the case. Designation of Counsel due by 8/6/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 6/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziplink, Inc. et al v. Ziplink, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziplink, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachs Family Limited Partnership Number One
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry M Zachs
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ziplink, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Entertainment Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Entertainment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Transfer & Trust Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Chornomud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hossein Mahdavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Susnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?