Clark v. Guerrero
Plaintiff: Michael E. Clark
Defendant: Adrian Guerrero
Case Number: 2:2009cv00141
Filed: January 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that an evidentiary hearing to determine the amount of damages, if any, that Clark is entitled to on default judgment, is set for 5/25/2021, at 10:00 am. That hearing will take place in Courtroom 6D of the Lloyd D. George Courthouse. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MINUTE ORDER re In-Person Hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Granting 203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting 200 Motion to Continue. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/31/2021 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Granting 198 Motion to Continue. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Granting 194 Motion to Continue. The evidentiary hearing currently scheduled for 6/23/2020, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby RESCHEDULED to 9/15/2020, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 189 plaintiff's motion to continue hearing be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the evidentiary hearing currently scheduled for 4/14/2020, be, and the same hereby is, RESCHEDULED to 6/23/2020, at 10 a.m. in courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 178 plaintiff's emergency motion to continue be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the evidentiary hearing currently scheduled for Tuesday, 2/18/2020, at 11:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED until Tuesday, 4/14/2020, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is referred to the Pro Bono Program for appointment for the purpose of representing Clark at an evidentiary hearing to determine a proper award of damages in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono Liaison - JQC)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 166 plaintiff's motion for hearing before district judge be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an evidentiary hearing in this matter be set for TUESDAY, 7/9/2019 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER that the parties shall submit a joint status report or proposed judgment within thirty (30) days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER that 151 Michael E. Clark's Proposed judgment is REJECTED.FURTHER ORDERED that 154 Motion for Hearing or Status Check is DENIED. The clerk shall enter judgment consistent with this order and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting 149 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that the clerk of court enter default against defendant Adrian Guerrero. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Michael Clark's failure to file a motion for default judgment within 60 days of the date of this order will result in dismissal pursuant to LR 41-1. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that 143 Proposed Pretrial Order is STRICKEN. The parties parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order, in the form attached as Attachment 1, no later than October 15, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 4:00 p.m., April 10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting 137 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney General for the State of Nevada withdrawn from the case as to Defendant Adrian Guerrero. Defendant Guerrero shall have until 10/16/13, in which to retain new counsel or file a statemen t that he will proceed pro se. Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant at address listed in this order. Parties shall have until 11/15/13, to file a joint pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Defendant Guerrero - EDS)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Denying 133 Defendant Adrian Guerrero's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 121 Plaintiff's Motion for Meet and Confer to the extent Plaintiff shall immediately send defense counsel a letter outlining in detail any discovery dispute he has. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Adopting 102 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that 115 Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Clerks Default is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claim against Warden Williams for retaliation under the 1st Amendment is DISMISSE D without leave to amend. Plaintiffs claim against Warden Williams for a 14th Amendment due process violation related to the wardens failure to mail a grievance to the Office of the Inspector General is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12//13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Denying 113 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with LRS 2-2. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER that 1) Defendant Guerrero's Motion for Order 106 is DENIED; 2) Defendant Guerrero shall answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by the deadlines established in the court's previous Order 105 ; 3) Plaintiff is reminded of his ob ligation under LSR 2-2 to promptly notify the court and opposing counsel of any change in address. Failure to comply with LSR 2-2 may result in a recommendation that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 88 be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 104 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 08/31/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying 95 Motion for a Trial Date, Denying 100 Motion for Discovery, and Referring Matter to Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen for screening of the 88 amended complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that plaintiffs motion seeking reconsideration 97 is GRANTED. This courts previous order dismissing the case 96 is VACATED and the case re-opened. Defendants file any opposition to plaintiffs motion for trial 95 by Friday, April 27, 2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that the case of Clark v. Guerrero (2:09-cv-00144-JCM-PAL) is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Documents 86 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Complaint deadline: 12/30/2010. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Transfer to NDOC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/7/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Denying 68 Motion for Default Judgment and Denying 69 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 8 Motion to Dismiss, Denying 22 Motion to Strike, and Denying 39 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/27/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Guerrero
Represented By: Rona-Kaye Tuitele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?