Western Oilfields Supply Company v. Goodwin et al
Plaintiff: Western Oilfields Supply Company
Defendant: Jerry W. Goodwin and Flora E. Goodwin
Counter Claimant: Jerry W. Goodwin
Cross Claimant: Flora E. Goodwin
Cross Defendant: Western Oilfields Supply Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv00286
Filed: February 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Denying 293 Motion to Vacate and Denying Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 AMENDED JUDGMENT in the amount of $346,841.56 is entered in favor of Flora E. Goodwin and Jerry W. Goodwin and against Western Oilfields Supply Company. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 1/23/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER that Defendants Motion to Increase Plaintiffs Supersedeas Bond 266 is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 1/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Jerry W. Goodwin. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/3/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER that Goodwins Motion for Attorneys Fees 210 is RESERVED. Westerns Motion for Attorneys Fees 224 is DENIED. Westerns Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond 232 is GRANTED. Goodwins Motion for Hearing 249 is DENIED as moot. Both parties are to simultaneously file a supplemental brief on the questions presented in this Order on 10/18/10. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER ACCEPTING and ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 162 . Plaintiffs Application for Writ of Possession (80-5) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/7/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Oilfields Supply Company v. Goodwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Oilfields Supply Company
Represented By: Timothy Gordon Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W. Goodwin
Represented By: Janna Jensen Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flora E. Goodwin
Represented By: Janna Jensen Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jerry W. Goodwin
Represented By: Amber Bay Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Flora E. Goodwin
Represented By: Amber Bay Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Western Oilfields Supply Company
Represented By: Timothy Gordon Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?