Bank of the West v. Great Falls Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Defendant: Great Falls Limited Partnership, RVS Southwest, LLC, Todd Slusher, Joyce Slusher and Roland V Sturm
Case Number: 2:2009cv00388
Filed: February 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Granting 149 Motion to Vacate 82 Amended Judgment; and Granting 150 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER that defendants Great Falls Limited Partnership, et. al.s motion to certify question to the Supreme Court of Nevada 128 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Setting Judgment Debtor Exams. (See Order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying as Moot 89 Motion for Leave to File Surreply and Denying 96 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Bank of the West and against Great Falls Limited Partnership, RVS Southwest, LLC, Joyce Slusher, Roland V Sturm, and Todd Slusher in the amount of $8,060,259.76. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) Modified judgment amount on 1/13/2011. NEF Regenerated. (ASB)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying 52 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 51 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Denied with regards to Joyce Slushers personal liability, and granted with regards to the principal sum reflected in the judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall jointly prepare and submit an appropriate amended judgment reflecting the correct principal sum of $8,060,259.76. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 26 Plaintiff Bank of the West's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 36 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joyce Slusher, RVS Southwest, LLC, Great Falls Limited Partnership, Roland V Sturm and Tod d Slusher. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs recover from Defendants the principal sum of $8,466,406.96, plus interest. Plaintiffs shall also recover from Defendants attorneys' fees, expenses and costs in an amount to be determined, plus interest. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the West v. Great Falls Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Represented By: Jeremy J. Nork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Falls Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVS Southwest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Slusher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Slusher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland V Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?