Arrow Productions, Ltd. v. V.C.X. Ltd. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Arrow Productions, Ltd.
Defendant: V.C.X. Ltd. and David H. Sutton
Case Number: 2:2009cv00737
Filed: April 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2011 Filing 53 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Judgment) (SLR) (Main Document 53 replaced on 10/18/2011) (SLR).
October 18, 2011 Filing 52 JUDGMENT in favor of Arrow Productions, Ltd. and against David H. Sutton and V.C.X. Ltd.. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 18, 2011 Filing 51 STIPULATION Findings Thereon, Order and Final Judgment by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Bench Trial set on stacked calendar for 3/13/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. Calendar Call set for 3/7/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/12/2011. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
August 19, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE by Defendants David H. Sutton, V.C.X. Ltd. of Available Trial Dates (Riley, Timothy)
August 16, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd. of Available Trial Dates (DeWitt, Clyde)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that counsel shall have until 8/15/2011 to either file the stipulated judgment with the court, or provide the court with three agreed upon trial dates for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 15, 2011 Filing 46 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 7/13/2011 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa K. Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Clyde DeWitt, Allen Lichtenstein; Def Counsel: Tmothy Riley; Court Reporter/FTR #: none; Time of Hearing: 4:30 pm. ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer to finalize their written settlement agreement and to prepare a proposed stipulated judgment to effectuate the terms of the agreement reached. A telephonic status check is scheduled for 7/25/11 at 4:30 p.m. Chambers will initiate the conference call. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed, the status check will be automatically vacated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 30, 2011 Filing 45 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 6/329/2011 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Clyde DeWitt, Allen Lichtenstein; Def Counsel: Timothy Riley; Court Reporter/FTR #: none; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.. A settlement was reached. ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer to finalize their written settlement agreement and to prepare a proposed stipulated judgment to effectuate the terms of the agreement reached. A Telephonic Status Check is scheduled for 7/13/2011 04:30 PM. Chambers will initiate the conference call. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed, the status check will be automatically vacated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 14, 2011 Filing 44 PROPOSED Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
May 31, 2011 Filing 43 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Joint) by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 6/29/2011 01:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 13, 2011 Filing 41 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 4/13/2011 before Judge Philip M. Pro. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Sherwood; Pla Counsel: Clyde F. DeWitt, Allen Lichtenstein, Also Present: Raymond Pistol (Client); Def Counsel: Timothy Charles Riley - Present Telephonically; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joan Quiros; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 7C; The Court received the notice of settlement filed on 1/18/2011, then received Plaintiff's Pretrial Order indicating difficulties with the approval of the settlement. Mr. DeWitt advises the Court his client, Mr. Pistol, did not agree with the settlement upon receiving the settlement agreement, at which time he filed Plaintiff's Pretrial Order. The Court hears the representations of counsel. IT IS ORDERED the parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 5/31/2011 listing three trial dates that are agreeable to all parties. The parties are further instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Leen's chambers to obtain a date for a settlement conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation Request to Appear at April 13, 2011 Status Conference by Telephone. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 11, 2011 Filing 39 STIPULATION Requesting that Timothy C. Riley, attorney for Defendants, be able to Appear via Telephone at April 13, 2011 Status Conference by Defendants David H. Sutton, V.C.X. Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
March 16, 2011 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 3/16/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Sherwood. IT IS ORDERED a Status Conference is set for 4/13/2011 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro/ (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
January 30, 2011 Filing 37 PROPOSED Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
January 18, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd. of Settlement (DeWitt, Clyde)
January 13, 2011 Filing 35 WITNESS LIST Disclosures Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. Proc. 26(a)(3) by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd..(DeWitt, Clyde)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the parties shall file a joint Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 1/18/2011. Failure to timely comply will result in the imposition of sanctions up to and including a recommendation to the District Judge of case dispositive sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 6, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert B Pool on behalf of Defendants David H. Sutton, V.C.X. Ltd.. (Pool, Robert)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Compel. Defendants V.C.X., Ltd. and David H. Sutton (Defendants) are ORDERED to make the initial disclosures required by Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 30 days of this order; It is ORDERED that any and all objections Defendants may have to (1) any of the Interrogatories identified in the Motion to Compel and/or (2) any of the Requests for Production of Documents identified in the Motion to Compel are deemed waived except the attorney-client privilege and the privilege against self-incrimination. Defendants are ORDERED to answer (1) the Interrogatories identified in the Motion to Compel and (2) the Requests for Production of Documents identified in the Motion to Compel within thirty (30) days of this Order. s expenses for the preparation of the Motion to Compel, Plaintiff is awarded $2,000.00, pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendants are ORDERED to deliver (by courier or overnight delivery service such as Federal Express), within 5 days of this order, a check in that amount, backed by good funds and payable to the Law Offices of Clyde DeWitt, to his office at 732 South Sixth Street, Suite 100, Las Vegas, NV 89101 The clerk is ORDERED to cancel the hearing on the Motion to Compel, which is now scheduled for May 18, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation Extending Discovery Dates ( Discovery due by 8/16/2010., Motions due by 9/15/2010., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
April 27, 2010 Filing 30 STIPULATION re 26 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and Discovery ; by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
April 27, 2010 Filing 29 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 28 Stipulation ; filed by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd. Extending the Dates Set Forth in the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (DeWitt, Clyde)
April 27, 2010 Filing 28 STIPULATION Requesting an Order Extending the Dates Set Forth in the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
April 16, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing on 26 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
April 14, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Disclosures and Discovery by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. Responses due by 5/1/2010. (DeWitt, Clyde)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kristan Elizabeth Lehtinen withdrawn as counsel for Defendants V.C.X. LTD. and David Sutton. Timothy Charles Riley shall continue to represent Defendants as lead counsel. He shall, however, retain local counsel who shall file a designation of resident counsel in compliance with LR IA 10-2(d) on or before May 6, 2010. Failure to comply with this order may result the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/7/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
April 5, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants V.C.X. LTD. and David Sutton by Kristan E. Lehtinen. by Defendants David H. Sutton, V.C.X. Ltd.. Motion ripe 4/5/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent to Withdraw)(Lovaas, Aaron)
March 17, 2010 Filing 23 Interim STATUS REPORT and Stipulated Request for an Order for a Limited, 60-day Stay and Extending Deadlines by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that sanctions are not warranted re 19 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/26/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
January 25, 2010 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants David H. Sutton, V.C.X. Ltd. Declaration of Timothy C. Riley. (Riley, Timothy)
January 25, 2010 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by David H. Sutton, V.C.X. Ltd.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Riley, Timothy)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. that Defendant shall show cause, in writing, no later than January 26, 2010 why sanctions should not be imposed for its failure to file a Certificate as to Interested Parties and its failure to comply with this courts Order 18 Show Cause Response due by 1/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/12/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Defendant V.C.X. shall file its Certificate of Interested Parties by 12/17/2009. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/2/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 5/17/2010. Motions due by 6/16/2010. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/30/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
November 25, 2009 Filing 16 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd. Stipulated. (DeWitt, Clyde)
November 17, 2009 Filing 15 ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint filed by V.C.X. Ltd.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/27/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/1/2010.(Riley, Timothy)
August 12, 2009 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against V.C.X. Ltd., David H. Sutton, filed by Arrow Productions, Ltd.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 12/10/2009.(DeWitt, Clyde)
August 10, 2009 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (DeWitt, Clyde)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 11 Stipulation, to withdraw 5/19/09 motions, without prejudice. Amended Complaint deadline: 6/15/2009. Answer due 9/15/09. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
May 28, 2009 Filing 11 STIPULATION by Plaintiff Arrow Productions, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (1) Withdrawing Defendants Pending Motions to Strike and Dismiss; (2) Granting Plaintiff Leave to File its First Amended Complaint; and (3) Establishing Deadlines)(DeWitt, Clyde)
May 19, 2009 Filing 10 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 12 - DECLARATION of Timothy C. Riley re 9 Motion to Dismiss; by Defendants V.C.X. Ltd., David H. Sutton. (Riley, Timothy) Modified on 5/29/2009 (AXM).
May 19, 2009 Filing 9 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 12 - First MOTION to Dismiss All Counts by Defendants V.C.X. Ltd., David H. Sutton. Responses due by 6/6/2009. (Riley, Timothy) Modified on 5/29/2009 (AXM).
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy Charles Riley for V.C.X. Ltd. and approving Kristan e. Lehinen as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/19/09. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
May 18, 2009 Filing 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Timothy C. Riley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kristan E. Lehtinen (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001236047) filed by Defendant V.C.X. Ltd.. Motion ripe 5/18/2009. (Lehtinen, Kristan)
April 24, 2009 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Arrow Productions, Ltd... There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (DeWitt, Clyde)
April 24, 2009 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (AXM)
April 24, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to V.C.X. Ltd.. (AXM)
April 24, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David H. Sutton. (AXM)
April 24, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AXM)
April 24, 2009 Case assigned to Judge Philip M. Pro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (AXM)
April 24, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against V.C.X. Ltd., David H. Sutton (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 09780000000001210747), filed by Arrow Productions, Ltd.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/4/2009. Proof of service due by 8/22/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to David H Sutton, # 2 Summons to V.C.X. Ltd., # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeWitt, Clyde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrow Productions, Ltd. v. V.C.X. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.C.X. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Productions, Ltd.
Represented By: Allen Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?