Powell et al v. Texvans Inc et al
Plaintiff: Olga Kaiser Powell and Laurie Moreno
Defendant: Viliamu Taimane Solovi, Euini Tala Tala, Texvans, Inc. and Land Air Express Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv01079
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER that Plaintiff's request that Mr. Solov's Social Security records be produced is now moot and the records will be destroyed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting 143 Defendants' Request for Exemption from Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/29/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Granting 135 Defendants' Request for Exemption from Attendance at the Settlement Conference. Mr. Solovi should be available during the conference by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Denying 104 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 112 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is Granted, in part, and Denied, in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 115 Defendants' Withdrawl of 102 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and To Quash. The hearing set for 2/16/11 at 2:00pm is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Redacted ORDER that Social Security Administration shall provide Plaintiff's attorney Leonard Stone a copy of Viliamu Taimane Solovi's disability claims file. Counsel shall deliver records to chambers for in camera review. Hearing scheduled for 1/13/2011 at 9:30 AM is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying 61 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall seal Exhibit A to DefendantsOpposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration/Clarification of the Courts September 9, 2010 Minute Order 68 Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/5/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting in part 45 Motion to Compel Discovery. Defendant Solovi will produce copies of medical records requested by Plaintiffs dating from January 1,2005 until the present. Granting 52 Motion for Protective Order. Granting 53 Motio n to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that medical billing and treatment records shall not be filed with the Court unless filed under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if they are not already sealed, the following pleadings andexhibi ts shall be sealed: (See Order for details)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the discovery deadline in this action is extended until January 18, 2010 and the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before October 29, 2010.( Discovery due by 1/18/2010., Joint Status Report due by 10/29/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell et al v. Texvans Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Kaiser Powell
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Moreno
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viliamu Taimane Solovi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euini Tala Tala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texvans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Air Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?