Tracey v. AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Plaintiff: Shane Tracey
Defendant: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01257
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiff Shane Tracey and against Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Plaintiff is awarded $11,825.00 for attorney's fees and pre-judgment interest on fees in the amount of $843. 62. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded $8,532.76 for costs and pre-judgment interest on costs in the amount of $608.75. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pre-judgment interest on the $150,000.00 awarded as damages is awarded in the amount of $10,701.37. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 12/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JUDGMENT UPON JURY VERDICT in favor of Shane Tracey against American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Denying 104 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/21/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Denying 102 & 103 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/17/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 56 Defendants motion to exclude evidence or testimony by any witness to any claims of insurance bad faith or breach of the Nevada Unfair Claims Handling or, alternatively, to prohibit said testimony and/or evidence during Phase I of a bifurcated trialIT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court Grants 57 Defendants Motion In Limine to Strike Documents and Witnesses Not Properly Disclosed by Plaintiff (except for the supplemental report of Dr. Dunn which was disclosed properly). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/14/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment on extra-contractual claims and Defendants Motion to Bifurcate trial. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/8/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that Dr. Kabins Motion to Reconsider 52 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss defendant Stebbins. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/4/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracey v. AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Tracey
Represented By: Jerry A Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Thomas E Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?