v. Longo et al
Plaintiff: Ohan Manoukian and Nora Manoukian
Defendant: Vito Longo, Verde Acres, LLC and Equipment Management Technology
Case Number: 2:2009cv01334
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 31:3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying without Prejudice 83 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam of Vito A. Longo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs Nora Manoukian, Ohan Manoukian against defendant Vito Longo. See Judgment for details. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 73 Emergency MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Vito Longo, Individually by Fox Rothschild, LLP. filed by Vito Longo, Equipment Management Technology. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defe ndant's Answer 51 is continued to 3/28/11 at 3:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Vito Longo must appeal personally or with new counsel of record to argue this motion. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulated Partial Judgment filed by Nora Manoukian, Ohan Manoukian. ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against defendant Verde Acres, LLC. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/1/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Joint Pretrial Order filed by Nora Manoukian, Ohan Manoukian. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Regarding Filing of Sealed Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Longo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vito Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verde Acres, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equipment Management Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohan Manoukian
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Manoukian
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?