Stephens Media LLC v. CitiHealth, L.L.C.

Case Number: 2:2009cv02285
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Trademark Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiff Stephens Media LLC and against Defendant CitiHealth, L.L.C. in the amount of $23,933.10. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 8/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 7, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 3, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER, re 22 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Granting 17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment against Defendant CitiHealth in the amount of $200,000 plus accrued interest fr om the date of the judgment until paid. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the entry of judgment to file a motion for attorneys fees that complies with Local Rule 54-16. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/03/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 6, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Stephens Media LLC against CitiHealth, L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 2, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a recommendation to dismiss this case will not be issued. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for an additional 60 days, to and including 07/30/2012, to file an application for default judgment for, among other things, a request for permanent injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 07/02/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens Media LLC v. CitiHealth, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?