Tafoya v. AC Delco Auto Service Center, Inc. et al
Case Number: 2:2009cv02395
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 88 Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying 80 Motion Defendant's Motion for an Exception to the Attendance Requirements re: Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/04/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Extend Deadline. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/18/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that counsel for Nissan North America Inc is removed from ECF Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tafoya v. AC Delco Auto Service Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?