Charov v. Perry et al
Case Number: 2:2009cv02443
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying 65 Notice of Default, Denying 66 Motion to Quash, and Denying 67 Motion for Production of Documents, Summary Judgment and Second Request for Sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file any further documents in this closed case. Any such documents shall be returned, unfiled, to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Dismissing 45 Complaint of Judicial Misconduct filed by Ilia Charov. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/25/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that Plaintiff ILIA CHAROVs Motion for Relief from a Court Order and Motion to Disqualify the Judge are both DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss 3 is GRANTED and the Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charov v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?