Shakopee Mdewakanton Sioux Community v. Templeton Gaming Corporation et al.,
Case Number: 2:2010cv00010
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Denying 92 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting 110 Motion to Strike. The Court will not consider the declaration of Kevin Close or lines 4:8 - 23 and 5:24 - 28 of the reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Trademark Infringement. ORDERED that the defendants are hereby enjoined from the use of the plaintiff's "Mystic" family of marks. FURTHER ORDERED that 61 Motion to Dismiss Countercl aim is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Declaratory Relief is DENIED as to injunctive relief and GRANTED as to monetary relief. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Shakopee Mdewakanton Sioux Community shall prepare an appropriate final judgment enjoining defendants' use of the "Mystic" trademark. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINAL JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. See Judgment for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDERED that Motion for Summary Judgment of Trademark Infringement 61 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants are hereby enjoined from the use of the plaintiff's "Mystic" family of marks. FURTHER ORDERED that Motion to Dismis s Counterclaim 61 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Declaratory Relief 64 is GRANTED as to injunctive relief and DENIED as to monetary relief. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Shakopee Mdewakanton Sioux community shall prepare an appropriate final judgment enjoining defendant's use of the "Mystic" trademark. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/29/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 86 replaced on 6/29/2011) (MMM).
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum and exhibits in support of its motion for summary judgment under seal. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff properly file the above mentioned documents with the court under seal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 53 Withdrawal of 44 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/20/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 36 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 7/20/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shakopee Mdewakanton Sioux Community v. Templeton Gaming Corporation et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?