Linder et al v. Ford Motor Company, et al

Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc., Evenflo Company Inc., Ford Motor Company and Bertha Meza
Plaintiff: Fernando Granados-Magallon and Matthew R. Linder
Case Number: 2:2010cv00051
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Unassigned - CIV
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2015 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 119 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 6, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that an in-chambers' telephonic hearing is scheduled for 1:00 p.m., May 14, 2015 re 101 Request for Continuance of Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 9, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Admissible Evidence of a Design Defect. Plaintiffs claims against Evenflo Company, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 28, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 49 Agreed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 2/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 5, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 1/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 14, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linder et al v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company Inc.
Represented By: Charles L Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Vaughn Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertha Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Granados-Magallon
Represented By: Joseph L Benson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew R. Linder
Represented By: Joseph L Benson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?