Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc. v. Ultra Internet Media, S.A. et al

Plaintiff: Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc. , DE
Defendant: Does 1-10, GigaMedia Limited and Ultra Internet Media, S.A.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00607
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting joint notice of dismissal of all consolidated matters. See order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/9/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying 6 MOTION to Dismiss Claim for Unjust Enrichment filed by Ultra Internet Media, S.A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc. v. Ultra Internet Media, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GigaMedia Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra Internet Media, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc. , DE
Represented By: Vanessa C Adriance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?