Olin Corporation et al v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Olin Corporation and Pioneer Americas LLC d/b/a Olin Chlor Alkali Products
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Factory Mutual Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pennsylvania, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Insurance Ireland Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00623
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) and the Parties' confidential partial settlement agreement, Counts II and III and Affirmative Defense IV in Olin's Action, and Count II of Continental's Action, are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees in connection with those Counts. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 and 58 and consistent with the Jury's answer of the Special Verdict Form, see Dkt. Nos . 294, 297 and 300, Final Judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiffs, Olin Corporation and Pioneer Americas d/b/a Olin Chlor Alkali Products, and against Defendant Continental Casualty Company, on all remaining claims in the consolidated actions, including Counts I and IV of Olin's Action and Count I of Continental's Action. Plaintiffs shall recover from the Defendant the amount to which the parties stipulated and agreed pursuant to their confidential partial settlement agreement dated January 26, 2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial held on 2/6/2013 before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Michael Zadina; Pla Counsel: Matthew Thomas and Craig Martin; Def Counsel: Peter Kanaris, Megan Ritenour, and David Heiss ; Court Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 9:15 a.m. to 5:45 p.m.; Courtroom: 7D; Witnesses Dr. Wayne Britton, Nicholas Bozovich, Keith Tepper, and Richard Romine are called, sworn, and testified. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 290 Motion for Judgment and Defendant's Motion for Directed Verdict are denied. Jury Trial is continued to 2/7/2013 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Denying as moot 246 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Damages for Bad Faith and of Continentals Net Worth. Denying as moot 244 Motion in Limine to To Exclude Evidence of Any Post-Coverage Position Actions to Support Violations of NRS 686A.310. Denying 224 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Thomas Jur. Denying 245 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Burl Daniel. Denying 247 Motion in Limine. Granting 261 Motion for Leave to File Additional Motions in Limine. Granting 262 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Settlement Agreement. Denying 264 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Former Counsel. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Granting 248 Motion File Documents Under Seal in Support of 245 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Burl Daniel (exhibits to be filed under seal). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Denying without prejudice 148 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Motions for Partial Summary Judgment 149 , 150 , and 151 are DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 161 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 195 Motion for Hearing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Denying 91 Defendants Property Insurers' Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 92 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 105 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Comp el is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that responses to Requests to Produce and answers to interrogatories must be provided on or before 9/21/11. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the depositions shall be re-noticed by Olin and shall proceed at a time convenient to parties and deponents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 8/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that Continental Casualty Companys Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Missouri 21 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 82 Supplement to 57 Verified Petition filed by Craig C. Martin. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 63 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/20/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olin Corporation et al v. Continental Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich Insurance Ireland Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olin Corporation
Represented By: Akke Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Americas LLC d/b/a Olin Chlor Alkali Products
Represented By: Akke Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?