Everest Gaming Limited v. Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Everest Gaming Limited
Defendant: Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc. and Harrah's License Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00904
Filed: June 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting joint notice of dismissal of all consolidated matters. See order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying 22 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/20/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everest Gaming Limited v. Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest Gaming Limited
Represented By: Jay Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrah's Interactive Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrah's License Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?