Brown v. Mae
Plaintiff: Kirsha Brown
Defendant: Sallie Mae
Case Number: 2:2010cv00920
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Complaint and this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/28/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Declining to Adopt 7 Report and Recommendation to Dismiss Case and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 8 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/23/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Denying 3 Motion for Assistance. Clerk shall file the complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 8/6/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/6/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsha Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?