Righthaven LLC v. No Quarter et al
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Larry C. Johnson and No Quarter
Case Number: 2:2010cv01022
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that defendants motion to set aside default 16 is GRANTED. Defendants motion to dismiss 18 is GRANTED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER for the Filing of a Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 4/29/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 3/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Responses due by 4/8/2011 and, Replies due by 4/29/2011iled re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larry C. Johnson and 16 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Motion to Dismiss filed by Larry C. Johnson. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. No Quarter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Quarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?