Righthaven LLC v. Vote For The Worst, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer and Vote For The Worst, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01045
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2011 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
June 19, 2011 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC, Other Affiliate Stephens Media LLC for Righthaven LLC added. Amended Certificate of Interested Parties. (Mangano, Shawn)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 48 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due 1 week after the decision on the pending 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/16/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) Modified to correct due date of document on 6/24/2011. (ASB)
June 13, 2011 Filing 48 STIPULATION re 47 Order for Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order, ; Stipulation and Request for Leave to Extend Time for Filing by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. (DeVoy, James)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that counsel for the Parties shall submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order pursuant to LR 26-1. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/10/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 44 Stipulation to Admit Evidence Relating to 33 Pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/1/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 27, 2011 Filing 45 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 44 Stipulation ; filed by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. (DeVoy, James)
May 24, 2011 Filing 44 STIPULATION re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Admission of New Evidence by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
May 15, 2011 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
May 9, 2011 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Mark A. Hineuber in Support of Righthaven LLC's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 40 Response to Motion, 41 Declaration, ; by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 9, 2011 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Steven A. Gibson in Support of Righthaven LLC's Response to Defedant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 40 Response to Motion ; by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 9, 2011 Filing 40 RESPONSE to 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 5/19/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 38 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 5/6/2011 re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants shall an additional 2 days from the time period from the standard briefing period under the Local Rules of Civil Practice to file his reply to Righthavens response. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 4, 2011 Filing 38 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC Stipulation for Extension of Time. (Mangano, Shawn)
April 23, 2011 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (DeVoy, James)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John L. Krieger and Nikkya G. Williams withdrawn from the case as to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 19, 2011 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Nikkya G. Williams re 34 Motion to Withdraw by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. (Williams, Nikkya) Docket entry relationship corrected on 4/21/2011. (MJZ)
April 19, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Nikkya G. Williams. by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Motion ripe 4/19/2011. (Williams, Nikkya)
April 17, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Responses due by 5/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
April 13, 2011 Filing 32 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/23/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/28/2011.(DeVoy, James)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Anne Pieroni withdrawn from the case as to Plaintiff Righthaven, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 6, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Certificate of Service by Anne Pieroni. by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 4/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Pieroni, Anne)
March 30, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shawn A. Mangano on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Mangano, Shawn)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 1, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Pieroni on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Pieroni, Anne)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Randazza and approving Attorney James Malcolm DeVoy as Designation of Local Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/31/11. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 27, 2011 Filing 25 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc J. Randazza and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James Malcolm DeVoy (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1866831) by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Motion ripe 1/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Applicant's Admissions)(DeVoy, James)
January 7, 2011 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Roger L. Hunt, on January 7, 2011.To properly distribute the case load for the magistrate judges in the District of Nevada, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge George W. Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings consistent with his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2-10-cv-1045-KJD-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference until the Court enters an order on 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 1/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 17, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James M DeVoy on behalf of Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. (DeVoy, James)
October 14, 2010 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to 18 MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference ; filed by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference (Williams, Nikkya)
October 12, 2010 Filing 20 DECLARATION of J. Charles Coons, Esq. re 19 Response to Motion ; by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
October 12, 2010 Filing 19 RESPONSE to 18 MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 10/22/2010. (Coons, John)
October 6, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Motion ripe 10/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nikkya G. Williams in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference)(Williams, Nikkya)
September 13, 2010 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Defendants' Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan E. Palmer)(Williams, Nikkya)
September 1, 2010 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Joseph C. Chu re 15 Response to Motion ; by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Coons, John)
September 1, 2010 Filing 15 RESPONSE to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 9/11/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Coons, John)
August 16, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Nathan E. Palmer in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Nathan E. Palmer in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, # 3 Declaration Declaration of David J. Della Terza in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Nikkya Williams in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Nikkya Williams in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Krieger, John) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 8/25/2010 (RFJ).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Answer due 8/16/2010. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 30, 2010 Filing 12 STIPULATION re 11 Summons Returned Executed, 10 Summons Returned Executed, 1 Complaint, ; Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Defendants David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC. (Krieger, John)
July 27, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 8 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,. David J. Della Terza served on 7/20/2010, answer due 8/10/2010. (Coons, John)
July 13, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,. Vote For The Worst, LLC served on 7/12/2010, answer due 8/2/2010. (Coons, John)
July 7, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
July 2, 2010 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to David J. Della Terza re 1 Complaint. (ECS)
July 1, 2010 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
July 1, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to 5 Proposed Summons to be issued: ERROR: Summons not issued due to summons not submitted in accordance with FRCP 4, David Tina not listed as a named defendant; CORRECTION: Pursuant to FRCP 4 summons are issued for each named defendant to be served. Attorney John Charles Coons advised to download and complete updated "AO 440 (Rev. 12/09) Summons in a Civil Action" form from Court's Website www.nvd.uscourts.gov listing a named defendant and refile as a separate event using "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event. (no image attached)(RFJ)
June 29, 2010 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
June 29, 2010 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (ASB)
June 29, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Vote For The Worst, LLC. (ASB)
June 29, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ASB)
June 28, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (ASB)
June 28, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David J. Della Terza, Nathan E. Palmer, Vote For The Worst, LLC (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1658243), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/8/2010. Proof of service due by 10/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Vote For The Worst, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Della Terza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan E. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vote For The Worst, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?