Employers Fire Insurance Company v. Basic Food Flavors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Employers Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Basic Food Flavors, Inc.
Unknown: Nathan Severson
Case Number: 2:2010cv01109
Filed: July 7, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Settlement. Case terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 5, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stay in the above captioned case be, and the same hereby is, lifted. Affirming 86 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 20, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a hearing on the 74 motion for order approving settlement is scheduled for 5/15/2012 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/20/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 16, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Granting 76 Joint Motion for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 4/20/2012 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers Fire Insurance Company v. Basic Food Flavors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basic Food Flavors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan Reinmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Nathan Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?