Bayer Schering Pharma AG et al v. Lupin Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Defendant: Lupin Ltd and Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01166
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Closing Case re 131 Joint Status Report filed by Bayer Schering Pharma AG and Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 109 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reset the Effective Date of the FDA's approval for the Defendants to Market Generic YAZ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the effective date of the FDAs approval of Lupins YAZ ANDA be set no earlier than June 30, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order on the FDA. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Denying 67 Motion for Summary Judgment, Granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying 98 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying 99 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Defendants Lupin Limited's and Lupin Pharmaceutical's Motion 89 to File Under Seal Certain "Confidential" Exhibits Accompanying the Supplemental Declaration of Kate M. Lesciotto in Support of Lupin's Motion for Summary Judgment that the Claims of the U.S. Reissue Patent are Invalid as Obvious 88 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 7/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Seal Declaration of Sundeep K. Addy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 7/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED ORDER that Plaintiffs Bayer Schering Pharma AG and Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Defendants Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc's Joint Motion to Consolidate 9 is DENIED without prejudice to a future motion to consolidate if there is a change in circumstances supporting such a motion. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that Plaintiffs Bayer Schering Pharma AG and Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Defendants Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s Joint Motion to Consolidate 9 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/1/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the Corrected Re-Filing of Stipulated Consolidated Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order 29 is GRANTED. Further, the Court adopts the Stipulated Consolidated Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order attached as Exhibit 1 to the Corrected Re-Filing 29 . The Re-Filing 28 is MOOT based on the Corrected Re-Filing 29 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 11/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 16 Defendants Lupin Limited's and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc's Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/26/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer Schering Pharma AG et al v. Lupin Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sundeep K. Addy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Represented By: Sundeep K. Addy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?