Deleon v. Neven et al
Petitioner: Steven Deleon
Respondent: Nevada Department Of Corrections, D.W. Neven and State Of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2010cv01348
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying 4 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for the filing of an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IFP Application or payment due by 10/30/2010. Copy of Blank IFP Application with Instructions and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with instructions mailed to Petitioner (DXS) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/30/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deleon v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Department Of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D.W. Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Nevada
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?