Roberts v. Cox
Plaintiff: Ken Roberts and Ken 1031399 Roberts
Defendant: James Cox
Case Number: 2:2010cv01538
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting (Nunc Pro Tunc) 4 Motion to Clarify Order Denying Motion to Certify Class Action, Denying 5 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and Granting 7 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Blank Complaint form with instructions mailed to plaintiff. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Chief of Inmate Services - ASB)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a completed and signed application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with all required financial documentation within thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/24/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying 2 MOTION to Certify Class Action, ( Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due 11/21/2010) Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken 1031399 Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?