Sanchez v. Administaff, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martha Sanchez
Defendant: Administaff, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01612
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice re: 21 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 6/20/2011. Motions due by 7/20/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 12/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Defendants Motion for Waiver of Attendance of Insurance Representative at ENE 16 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 11/22/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Administaff, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administaff, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Sanchez
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?