Righthaven LLC v. EMP Media, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Righthaven, LLC
Defendant: Neil Infante, Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan and EMP Media, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01613
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Robert J Johnston
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 Filing 9 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (ASB)
December 20, 2010 Civil Case Terminated per #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ASB)
December 20, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
October 8, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
September 30, 2010 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to EMP Media, Inc. (ASB)
September 29, 2010 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
September 21, 2010 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ASB)
September 21, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, and EMP Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to EMP Media, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to Shad Applegate)(ASB)
September 21, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ASB)
September 20, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (ASB)
September 20, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHAD APPLEGATE, BURAK BASKAN, EMP MEDIA, INC., NEIL INFANTE (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1742482), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/30/2010. Proof of service due by 1/18/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. EMP Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burak Baskan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMP Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven, LLC
Represented By: John Charles Coons
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?