The Richard And Sheila J. McKnight 2000 Family Tust, Richard McKnight Trustee
Plaintiff: The Richard And Sheila J. McKnight 2000 Family Tust, Richard McKnight Trustee
Case Number: 2:2010cv01617
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1725 Collection under Contract Guaranty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting ECF No. 491 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing Debt Acquisition Company of America LLC and DACA-Castaic LLC as parties; denying ECF No. 492 Motion to Extend Time; directing Clerk to close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER granting ECF No. 472 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER denying ECF No. 444 Motion to Disqualify Lisa Rasmussen. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER denying ECF No. 413 Motion to Approve Settlement Proposal and denying ECF No. 425 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER Granting 410 Motion for Default Judgment. Movants shall submit a proposed form of judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER Granting 432 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 413 MOTION Approval of Settlement Proposal and Reques for Hearing. Amended Response due by 3/18/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER Directing the Parties to Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Oral Argument regarding 410 Motion for Default Judgment and 413 Motion for Approval of Settlement Proposal and Request for Hearing are set for 02/12/2016 10:00 A.M. in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/02/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER Granting 390 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER Granting 387 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER Granting 385 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER re 376 Notice of Ratification of Real Party in Interest and Order Authorizing Certain Direct Lenders to Proceed on Guaranty Claims. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER Granting 366 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Cindy Lee Stock for DACA-Castaic, LLC, and Debt Acquisition Company of America, in place of Attorney Michelle L. Abrams. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER Granting 361 Motion to Extend Time. Status Report due by 4/20/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 DEFAULT JUDGMENT is entered on Counterclaim of DACA as against the Barkett Parties by granting declaratory relief as enumerated in this judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of DACA as to the Third Party Complaint filed on January 13, 2012 (D.I. 156 & 157), and the Barkett Parties shall take nothing by way of that Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER Granting 331 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER Granting 347 Motion for Request for Telephonic Appearance. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order by 6/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER Granting 318 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 259 Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Strike; Granting in part and Denying in part 286 Third-Party Defendants' Motion for Default Judgment; and Granting in part and Denying in part 289 Thi rd-Party Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 247 Answer and Counterclaim is STRICKEN as to the answer to the first counterclaim in the 231 DACA Pleading, but not as to the answers to the second counterc laim and the supplemental counterclaim therein. The Court will enter default judgment in favor of DACA and against Defendants as to DACAs first third-party counterclaim, but not as to its supplemental counterclaim. Counsel for DACA shall SUBMIT a proposed form of judgment. DACAs second third-party counterclaim for appointment of a receiver is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Denying 240 Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order and Granting in part 235 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees. Fees are awarded in the amount of $3096.00. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 04/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Granting 220 MOTION to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery And For Sanctions filed by Richard and Sheila J. McKnight 2000 Family Trust. Defendant William Barkett shall respond to Plaintiff's Request no later than 4/16/13. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded reasonable expenses incurred in bringing 220 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs' memorandum due within 14 days. Defendant Barkett shall have 10 days to respond. Plaintiffs shall have 5 days to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER that the 03/25/2013 deposition of Craig P. Orrock by DACA-Castaic is STAYED pending a ruling on the instant 228 Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any oppositions shall be filed no later than 04/04/2013. Any reply shall be filed no later than 04/15/2013. A Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 03/20/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Adopting and Accepting 205 Report and Recommendation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 175 Answers of Defendants William J. Barkett, Castaic Partners, LLC, Castaic Partners III, LLC, are STRICKEN. The Clerk of the Court shall enter DEFAULT accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Granting 208 Counter Claimant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Counterclaim and Fourth Party Complaint as follows. DACA shall file an Amended Answer to Third-Party Complaint, Third-Party Counterclaim, and Fourth-Party Complaint in order to consolidate its answer, its existing claims, and its supplemental claims into a single pleading within 14 days. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re 201 Response to Order to Show Cause. IT IS ORDERED that William J. Barkett, Castaic Partners, LLC, Castaic Partners II, LLC and Castaic Partners III, LLC shall have until 10/29/12 to associate new counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Denying 177 , 178 , and 179 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/23/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Granting 193 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Local Counsel Brian E. Holthus withdrawn from the case as to William J. Barkett, Castaic Partners, LLC, Castaic Partners II, LLC and Castaic Partners III, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that William J. Barkett, Castaic Partners, LLC, Castaic Partners II, LLC and Castaic Partners III, LLC shall have until 8/6/12 to associate new local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 JUDGMENT in favor of Richard and Sheila J. McKnight 2000 Trust and against Willian J. Barkett in the principle amount of $100,000 with interest at the rate of 20% per annum from and after 9/1/06. attorney's fees in the amount of $15,860.40 and costs in the amount of $774.25. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Denying without prejudice 176 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to file a revised Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order within 7 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 DACA's Motion for Summary Judgment and 147 and 148 Kapp's Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting in part 69 Motion for Attorney Fees. Granting 70 Motion for Judgment. Granting in part and Denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss. The third cause of action in the Kapp CI is dismissed. Denying 74 Motion to Dismiss Rasmussen CI. Denying 91 Motion to Dismiss Crossclaim. Denying 118 Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim. Denying 76 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Granting in part 95 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment. Granting 108 Motion to Strike Crossclaim. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying 16 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Granting in part and Denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss. The second claim for declaratory judgment is dismissed. Granting in part and Denying in part 27 Motion for Summary Judgme nt. The Court grants summary judgment to Plaintiffs on the breach of guaranty claim against Barkett. Granting 24 Motion to Intervene and 33 Motion to Intervene. Clerk will enter judgment and keep the case open pending resolution of Intervenors' claims. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Richard And Sheila J. McKnight 2000 Family Tust, Richard McKnight Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Richard And Sheila J. McKnight 2000 Family Tust, Richard McKnight Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?