Righthaven LLC v. LEON et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: MICHAEL LEON and MEDBILLZ
Case Number: 2:2010cv01672
Filed: September 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Filing 65 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order Dismissing Case) (ASB)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to FRCP 4(m). IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to Medbillz, Inc. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 6, 2011 Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 9/6/2011. By Deputy Clerk: PCE. In accordance with ECF 60 , Defendant Leon's Motion 54 for Preliminary Injunction, is hereby DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PE)
August 5, 2011 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
July 25, 2011 Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 7/25/2011. By Deputy Clerk: K. Johnson. Based upon the 60 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, IT IS ORDERED the July 26, 2011 hearing as to the 54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is VACATED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KXJ)
July 24, 2011 Filing 60 DECLARATION of J. Malcolm DeVoy re 56 MOTION to Stay re 53 Judgment on Attorney Fees, 52 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Stay Request ; Verifying payment and requesting that scheduled hearing be vacated by Defendant Michael Leon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application 56 for a temporary stay of thirty (30) days relating to the entry of the Judgment 53 entered in this case on July 5, 2011, is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff shall have until 5:00 p.m. on July 25, 2011 to pay Defendant's fees and costs. The hearing regarding Defendant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 54 scheduled for July 26, 2011 at 1:00 p.m. shall be vacated upon the parties' written request, as long as a Receipt of Funds signed by Defendant or his counsel is attached to the written request to vacate said hearing. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 07-12-2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PE)
July 12, 2011 Filing 57 RESPONSE to 56 MOTION to Stay re 53 Judgment on Attorney Fees, 52 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Stay Request, filed by Defendant Michael Leon. Replies due by 7/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(DeVoy, James)
July 12, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION to Stay re 53 Judgment on Attorney Fees, 52 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Stay Request by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 7/12/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying 47 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2011 Filing 58 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant, Michael Leon's Motion 54 for Preliminary Injunction is hereby set for 7/26/2011 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (PE)
July 9, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Michael Leon. Responses due by 7/26/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction)(DeVoy, James)
July 5, 2011 Filing 53 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of James DeVoy and Randazza Legal Group and against Plaintiff Righthaven, LLC in the amount of $3,815.00. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 42 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff Righthaven is ORDERED to pay Mr. DeVoy and Randazza Legal Group $3,815.00 in fees and costs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 27, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL LEON, MEDBILLZ (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1749280), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/7/2010. Proof of service due by 1/25/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. LEON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDBILLZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?