United States of America v. $49,220.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $49,220.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2010cv01828
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that Default Judgment of Forfeiture be entered against the defendant property and all persons or entities who claim an interest in the defendant property in the above-entitled action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 17 Settlement Agreement, Stipulation for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture as to Andrew Joseph Neville. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Proposed Order for Summons and Warrant of Arrest; filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $49,220.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $49,220.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?