Wallace v. USAA Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mariellen M Wallace
Defendant: USAA Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01855
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 53 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion in Limine #1 28 and Motion in Limine #2 30 are GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike 29 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Exhibits 4 (#18-4), 11 (#18-11), 13 (#18-13), and 20 (#14, reproduced at#25-5) are stric ken. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 18 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs Countermotion for Summary Judgment 23 is DENIED. The parties shall lodge their proposed joint pretrial order within thirty (30) days from entry of this Order. See Local Rule 16-4 and 26-1(e)(5). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/29/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER re 10 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/19/2011. Motions due by 8/19/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 12/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. USAA Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariellen M Wallace
Represented By: John C Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?