Woodsford v. Friendly Ford
Plaintiff: Robert J. Woodsford
Defendant: Friendly Ford
Case Number: 2:2010cv01996
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 47 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying 40 Defendant's Motion for Waiver of Attendance of Insurance Representative at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Defendant's 23 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court grants the motion regarding each of Plaintiff's claims of age discrimination. The motion is denied regarding Plaintiff's retaliation claims. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodsford v. Friendly Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friendly Ford
Represented By: Gina Mushmeche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Woodsford
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?