Moapa Band of Paiutes et al v. United States Bureau Of Land Management et al

Defendant: Ken Salazar, United States Bureau Of Land Management and Ronald Wenker
702) 341-5300 (fax: Moapa Band of Paiutes and Sierra Club, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02021
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order 50 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 36 is DENIED. The Federal Defendants Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 41 is GRANTED. Intervenor-Defendant Nevada Power Companys Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 42 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order 40 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Rachel Kathleen Bowen for Ken Salazar, United States Bureau Of Land Management and Ronald Wenker. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order 34 ORDER GRANTING Joint 33 Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and approval of the parties' Stipulation on Surface-Disturbing Activity and Briefing Schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER that Proposed Intervenor-Defendant Nevada Power Companys Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Nevada Power Company is hereby accorded full party status as a defendant in this case and Intervenor-Defendant Nevada Power Companys Answer to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief is hereby deemed to be filed. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER granting Defendants' 17 Motion to Extend Deadline. Defendants to respond to Complaint by 2/14/2011. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moapa Band of Paiutes et al v. United States Bureau Of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 341-5300 (fax: Moapa Band of Paiutes
Represented By: Daniel Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 341-5300 (fax: Sierra Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau Of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?