Ball v. SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Brett J Ball
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02064
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Intervene and to Expunge Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. Aztec Foreclosure Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First and Third Causes of Action 7 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying 13 Motion to Remand to State Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have ten days from the date of this Order within which to file a Response re 7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed 12/1/10. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett J Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?