Bailey v. Aurora Loan Servicing et al
Plaintiff: James Bradley Bailey
Defendant: Aegis Wholesale Corporation, Aurora Loan Servicing, Cal-Western and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Case Number: 2:2010cv02119
Filed: December 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING with leave to amend Plaintiff's TILA and RESPA claims. Amended complaint due 8/29/11. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's state law causes of action are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all othe r motions currently pending in this action are DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED to the extent it conforms to this order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/1/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Dismiss defendant Aurora Loan Servicing. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Striking 25 and 26 Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Aurora Loan Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bradley Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?