Righthaven LLC v. Drudge et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Matt Drudge and DrudgeReportArchives.com
Case Number: 2:2010cv02135
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2011 Filing 10 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (ASB)
February 15, 2011 Civil Case Terminated per 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ASB)
February 15, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Pieroni, Anne)
February 15, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Pieroni on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Pieroni, Anne)
January 7, 2011 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Roger L. Hunt, on January 7, 2011.To properly distribute the case load for the magistrate judges in the District of Nevada, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge George W. Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings consistent with his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2-10-cv-2135-KJD-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
December 17, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
December 9, 2010 Filing 5 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 complaint) (EDS)
December 9, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matt Drudge. (EDS)
December 9, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 9, 2010 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
December 8, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (EDS)
December 8, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matt Drudge, DrudgeReportArchives.com (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1817738), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/18/2010. Proof of service due by 4/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Drudge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Drudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DrudgeReportArchives.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Represented By: John Charles Coons
Represented By: Shawn A. Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?