Righthaven LLC v. Combs Featured Case
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Keith Combs
Case Number: 2:2010cv02145
Filed: December 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The complaint in this action was filed on* 12/09/10.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Keith Combs.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 8/11/2011. (SRK)
January 19, 2011 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Roger L. Hunt, on January 19, 2011.To properly distribute the case load for the magistrate judges in the District of Nevada, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge George W. Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings consistent with his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2-10-cv-2145-PMP-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
December 9, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 9, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Philip M. Pro and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (EDS)
December 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith Combs (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1819105), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/19/2010. Proof of service due by 4/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Represented By: John Charles Coons
Represented By: Shawn A. Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?