Mulder v. GE Consumer Finance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vanessa Mulder
Defendant: GE Consumer Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02221
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than April 15, 2011 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file her Certificate of Interested Parties by 1/14/2011. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulder v. GE Consumer Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Consumer Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin R Diamond
Represented By: Kathleen M. Maynard
Represented By: Daniel J O'Rielly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Mulder
Represented By: John A Piet
Represented By: Charles T Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?