2-Way Computing, Inc. v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al

Plaintiff: 2-Way Computing, Inc.
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation and Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Counter Defendant: 2-Way Computing, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Sprint Nextel Corporation and Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00012
Filed: January 5, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2015 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 315 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims of infringement that Plaintiff raised or could have raised in this action are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. All claims, defenses, or counterclaims that Defendant raised are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 21, 2015 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 291 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 20, 2015 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 278 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 30, 2015 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 235 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. K James Sangston; William H. Boice and Matthew M Lubozynski withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 18, 2015 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 181 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 28, 2015 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 180 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 25, 2015 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 163 Motion for Partial Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 3, 2015 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 187 Motion to Seal and granting 199 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 14, 2014 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 179 Motion to Seal. Memorandum of Points and Authorities and any supporting declaration or affidavit is due by 11/26/2014. The 182 Unredacted Motion and Exhibits shall remain under seal until November 26, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 15, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 162 Consent Motion for Clarification of Orders on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 27, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 134 Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of intervening rights. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 25, 2014 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 156 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 9, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re disputed claims of U.S. Patent No. 5,434,797. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 20, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 38 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 21, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney K. James Sangston and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad Fears for Sprint Nextel Corporation and Sprint Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2-Way Computing, Inc. v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: 2-Way Computing, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Milan S Kapadia
Represented By: Paul A Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2-Way Computing, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Milan S Kapadia
Represented By: Paul A Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Kristopher L. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Kristopher L. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Kristopher L. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Kristopher L. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?