Cox v. Neven et al
Plaintiff: Michael Steve Cox
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Robert B. Bannister, Andres Benavidez, Amy Calderwood, Darin Cool, James G. Cox, Roland Daniels, J. Davis, K.. Greenalch, William Kuloloia, Efrain Lona, Joseph Masterson, Cole Morrow, Dwight Neven, C. Pressler, Gilberto Villanueva, Duane Wilson and Russell Wright
Case Number: 2:2011cv00103
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is renewed and GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly, and to accept no further filings from Plaintiff in this action. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying 77 Motion to to Hold Proceedings in Abeyance. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that 75 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal will be granted if Plaintiff files proof that he has associated with counsel within 60 days. FURTHER ORDERED that 51 Motion for Summary Judgment is TERMINATED pending proof that Plaintiff has associa ted with counsel. If Plaintiff fails to file proof that he has associated with counsel within 60 days, then the Motion for Summary Judgment will be renewed and granted in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/18/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 59 Motion to Compel Re Discovery Requests to Oppose Summary Judgment. Denying 65 Motion to Expedite Decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that a Hearing by telephone conference call is scheduled for 8/31/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall make all necessary arrangements with the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated to insure the participation of the Plaintiff in the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 8/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying 43 Motion for Default. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying 36 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 12/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Denying 33 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Denying 24 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants are ordered to respond to the Complaint on or before November 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying 17 Motion for Adequate Legal Supplies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 8/31/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 25 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 7/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying 14 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying 7 Motion for Discovery, "In Camera" of 4-Unserved Defendants to Affect Timely Service of Process Alternative Defense Counsel Accept Service Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B. Bannister
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Benavidez
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Calderwood
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Cool
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Cox
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Daniels
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.. Greenalch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kuloloia
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrain Lona
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Morrow
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Villanueva
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Wilson
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Wright
Represented By: Timothy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Steve Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?