Slagowski et al v. Central Washington Asphalt, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Dean, Anika Slagowski, Candace Slagowski, Quentin Slagowski and Rowan Slagowski
Defendant: Central Washington Asphalt, Inc., Donald Hannon and James Wentland
Case Number: 2:2011cv00142
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the January 31, 2017 Calendar Call and the February 6, 2017 trial setting are vacated. By February 10, 2017, the parties shall submit a stipulation and proposed order dismissing this case or a joint report on the status of their efforts to finalize their settlement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 01/09/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER Granting 540 Motion for an Exception to the Attendance Requirements at the Settlement Conference and 546 Joinder. Central Washington Asphalt, Donald Frank Hannon, Chip Fenton, and Fenton Trucking are excused from attending the September 28, 2016 settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 09/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting 531 Report and Recommendation GRANTING 523 Motion. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER Granting 536 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER re 523 Motion filed by Central Washington Asphalt, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER Granting 518 Motion to Substitute Party. Estate of Mitchell Forrest Zemke substituted for Mitchell Forest Zemke. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER re 520 Unopposed Motion. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiffs' 464 Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions Due to Spoliation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 03/07/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER Granting 474 Motion to Strike Joinders 461 , 462 , and 463 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER Denying as Moot Defendants' 438 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 02/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER Granting 493 Motion for Removal of Electronic Servicelist as to Elizabeth Mikesell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER Granting 470 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to 430 , 431 , 432 , 433 , 434 , 435 , 436 , and 437 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER Granting 450 Stipulation to Extend Time to Re ply to 429 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 8/27/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER Denying 386 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 418 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER Granting 442 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 428 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER Granting 439 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 430 , 432 , 434 , 436 , and 438 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER Granting 425 Stipulation for Dismissal of Phillip Law's Claims, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER Granting 423 Stipulation to Extend Deposition Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER Granting 421 Stipulation for Dismissal of Dorren Law's Claims with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER Accepting 411 Report and Recommendation. It Is Ordered that 387 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is Granted. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER Granting 342 Motion to Reopen Discovery. The Slagowskis are granted LEAVE to file a Motion to Compel by 2/16/2015. Responses are due by 2/23/2015. Replies are due by 3/2/2015. Discovery is REOPENED for the limited purpose of cond ucting discovery on the newly added aiding-and-abetting claims. Rejecting 374 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Motions due by 7/7/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2015. Denying 351 Motion for Attorney Fees.Denying 370 Motio n to Preclude. Deferring 387 MOTION Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach re: 387 MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER that Central Washington Asphalt must comply with Local Rule 26-7(a) and file a copy of Defendant Hannon's Draft Answers and Final Answers under seal by January 30, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Central Washington Asphalt must highlight or underline the differences between the Draft Answers and Final Answers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER Setting a Hearing for 2/3/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach RE: 342 MOTION to Reopen Case for the Limited Purpose of Adding a New Cause of Action in the Amended Complaint 351 MOTION f or Attorney Fees 370 MOTION in Limine To (1) Preclude Use of Inadvertently Disclosed, Privileged Document During Discovery or Trial, (2) Compel Return or Destruction of this Privileged Document, and (3) for Sanctions and 374 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Denying 367 Motion to Compel. Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 334 Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that stipulation regarding schedule to complete depositions is due by 10/15/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if CWA De fendants file a motion to reopen discovery based on the new allegation in the amended complaint, that motion must be filed by 10/15/14. Any opposition to the motion to reopen discovery must be filed by 10/25/14. The reply in support of the motion to reopen discovery must be filed by 10/30/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER Denying 161 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 273 Motion to Amend the FRCP Rule 16 Case Management Conference Order to Allow Plaintiffs to Amend their Complaint. Plaintiff's 306 Objection to 302 Report and Recommendation is Sustained. Denying 318 Motion to Strike.Plaintiffs shall filed and serve their amended complaint immediately. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER re 305 Non-Opposition to 304 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Denying without prejudice 143 , 151 , and 153 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Denying 293 Objection to 288 Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER Denying 251 Motion in Limine. Denying 266 Supplemental Motion in Limine. Denying 271 Motion to Strike. Denying 279 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Denying as moot 204 and 205 Objections. Granting in part and Denying in part 208 and 210 Objections. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Denying 73 Defendants' Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings; Denying 81 Plaintiffs' Counter-Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Sanctions; Denying 98 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re Discovery; and Denying 101 Defend ants' Counter-Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Sanctions. The depositions of the individual Defendants must be conducted on or before 01/03/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Dispositive Motions are due by 1/15/2014 and Proposed Joint Pre trial Order is due by 2/14/2014. Defendants 99 Emergency Motion for Protective Order was GRANTED in the courts 05/29/2013, 103 Minute Order STAYING the 06/03/2013, deposition. The Slagowski Plaintiffs counsel may re-notice Mr. Fentons deposition and examine Mr. Fenton first. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 07/02/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 5/22/2013 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that 96 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at 73 Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Anticipated Criminal Proceedings is GRANTED. The call in number is 1-702-868-4911, pass-code 123456. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Patricia Dean's Motion 5 to remove Candace Slagowski and have herself named as Guardian ad Litem is DENIED. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slagowski et al v. Central Washington Asphalt, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Washington Asphalt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wentland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dean
Represented By: Jason Runckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Slagowski
Represented By: Neil G. Galatz
Represented By: Gerald I. Gillock
Represented By: Jason Runckel
Represented By: Timothy G. Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Slagowski
Represented By: Neil G. Galatz
Represented By: Gerald I. Gillock
Represented By: Antonia C. Killebrew
Represented By: Timothy G. Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Slagowski
Represented By: Neil G. Galatz
Represented By: Gerald I. Gillock
Represented By: Jason Runckel
Represented By: Timothy G. Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowan Slagowski
Represented By: Neil G. Galatz
Represented By: Gerald I. Gillock
Represented By: Jason Runckel
Represented By: Timothy G. Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?