United States of America v. $158,000.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $158,000.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2011cv00162
Filed: January 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against the defendant property and all persons or entities who claim an interest in the defendant property in the above- entitled action, including Annie K. Adams. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE in favor of United States of America and against $158,000.00 in United States Currency. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Request for Entry of Default and to Replace with Amended Request. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/29/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for Property. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $158,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $158,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?