GNLV, Corp. v. Mueller

Plaintiff: GNLV, Corp.
Defendant: Luca Mueller
Case Number: 2:2011cv00663
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant shall file with this Court and serve upon Plaintiff within 30 days a report in writing under oath setting in detail the manner and form in which Defendant has complied with this Court's Order. The Bond posted in the amount of $100 shall be applied to this preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and Finance - SLR)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file its Certificate of Interested Parties by 5/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Within 30 days Defendant Shall File a report in writing under oath setting forth in detail the manner and form in which Defendant has complied with this Court's Order. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2011 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Replies due by 5/9/2011. Responses due by 5/5/2011. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GNLV, Corp. v. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luca Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GNLV, Corp.
Represented By: Laraine M I Burrell
Represented By: Lauri S. Thompson
Represented By: Shauna L. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?