Righthaven LLC v. Sieber Featured Case

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Bob Sieber
Case Number: 2:2011cv00729
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of subjectmatter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, within 10 days of this order why the court should not dismiss this matter for lack of standing. All proceedings are STAYED pending the court's determination of plaintiff's standing. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2011. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 6, 2011 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Mangano, Shawn) (Entered: 05/06/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Sieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Shawn A. Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Sieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?