Calvert v. Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Plaintiff: Stacy Calvert
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01004
Filed: June 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (#25 in lead case 2:11-cv-00333-LRH-PAL) is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (#45 in lead case 2:11-cv- 00333-LRH-PAL) is GRANTED as to the NDTPA claim and DENIED as to the FDCPA claim. FURTHER ORDERED that Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (#46 in lead case 2:11-cv-00333-LRH-PAL) is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Robert C. Jones for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/1/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than April 23, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvert v. Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Calvert
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?