Milicevic vs Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc. and DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
702) 386-9393 (fax: Marina Milicevic
Case Number: 2:2011cv01369
Filed: August 24, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Remand in MDL 2197. Case reopened. Signed by MDL M MDL on 11/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 20, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by MDL Panel on 9/20/2011. Signed by None Assigned NA on 9/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 21, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Certified Conditional Transfer Order. Signed by MDL Panel on 9/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milicevic vs Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 386-9393 (fax: Marina Milicevic
Represented By: Christopher G. Gellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.