Villarreal v. USA
Petitioner: Salomon Juan Marcos Villarreal
Actually Named As United States: AUSA USA
Case Number: 2:2011cv01594
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 40 Motion to Enforce IRS Summons. Denying 1 petition to quash summons or, in the alternative, for additional time to prepare evidence of bad faith. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying 36 Motion for status hearing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Attorney by James E. Weaver. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 10/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villarreal v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salomon Juan Marcos Villarreal
Represented By: John V. McDermott
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rugg
Represented By: Jeffrey Samuel Rugg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Actually named as united states: AUSA USA
Represented By: Carlos A Gonzalez
Represented By: James E. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?