Wilson v. Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Karen J. Wilson
Defendant: Jose Castro, Clem-Trans, Inc., Jesse R Cruz, U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc., U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc., A.P. Express LLC and A.P. Express Worldwide LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00051
Filed: January 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 42:1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER that within 20 days of the filing of this order the identified motions and related briefs of the parties shall be re-filed in the base file. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Denying 175 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File to File Sur-Reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 152 Lexington Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Denying 171 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any dispute arises regarding the documents produced in response to the plaintiff's discovery requests at issue herein, or any other discovery request, plai ntiff must comply with LR 26-7(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and meet and confer in a good faith effort to resolve any dispute before filing a motion with the court. Failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Denying 64 Motion for More Definite Statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 77 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 108 Motion to Dismiss re: 52 Second Amended Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Denying 126 Defendants' Motion to Clarify and Request for Revision of Minute Order. The 125 Minute Order can be clarified during the hearing on January 24, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Substitute Defendants. Clerk of the Court shall file the plaintiff's second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clem-Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse R Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. Express Worldwide LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen J. Wilson
Represented By: Todd A Bresney
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?