Young v. Mercury Casualty Company
Plaintiff: David Brigham Young
Defendant: Mercury Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00091
Filed: January 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER Denying 423 Motion for Attorney Fees; ORDER Denying 429 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER that 146 Defendant Mercury Casualty Company's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 148 and 149 Plaintiff David B. Young's Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary judgm ent is granted in favor of Plaintiff on his claim for violation of N.R.S. 686A.310(f), and DENIED as to all other claims. FURTHER ORDERED that the jury may consider an award of punitive damages with respect to Plaintiff's claims for bad faith and for violation of N.R.S. 686A.310(e) and (f). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Granting 205 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mark Hutchings withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting 174 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Glenn H Truitt withdrawn from the case as counsel for plaintiff David Brigham Young. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Granting 153 Stipulation. Responses due by 8/24/2015, Replies due by 9/8/2015 re 146 and 149 . Responses due by 8/10/2015 re 145 . Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff David Brigham Young's 114 Motion to Compel. Defendant Mercury Casualty Company shall produce the documents or portions of documents listed in this Order to Plaintiff by 5/8/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 83 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. IT IS ORDERED that Robert L. Ansara added as Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that Mr. Hutchings shall register with CM/ECF and a Notice of Compliance with Special Order 109 shall be completed and filed no later than 5 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that Plaintiff supplement 5 Certificate of Interested Parties no later than 4/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 34 Defendant's Motion for an Order Requiring Supplement to 5 Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a supplemented Certificate of Interested Parties within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Withdrawing 21 Defendant's Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and Granting 22 Defendant's Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order to the extent it requests relief from the order that Defendant depose Dr. Reid and Dr. Jasey to evaluate Plaintiffs cognitive capacity to understand the nature of these proceedings and to assist his counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/04/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Mercury Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brigham Young
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Represented By: Federico C Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?