Systemify, LLC v. PacketMotion, Inc. et al

Defendant: VMware, Inc. and PacketMotion, Inc.
Plaintiff: Systemify, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00130
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing. Settlement Conference reset for 9/7/2012 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 7, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 5, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 3/19/2012 re 18 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Systemify, LLC v. PacketMotion, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacketMotion, Inc.
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Systemify, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Todd Brandt
Represented By: Darrell Dotson
Represented By: Gregory P. Love
Represented By: Scott Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?