Lee v. Mazzocheri et al

Defendant: Julia Barton, Bill Boyd, Kathie Chum, Ivana Trump Mazzocheri and John Waihee
Plaintiff: Robin M Lee
Case Number: 2:2012cv00189
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 5 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 23, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider 5 Order. This Case shall proceed to the 5 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 26, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Hearing is set for 10/22/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston re 6 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider 5 Order and 1 Application to Proceed In FormaPauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 24, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 4/4/2012 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston re 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robin M Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 2/24/2012. Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on the Plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Mazzocheri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathie Chum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivana Trump Mazzocheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Waihee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?