Federal Trade Commission v. AMG Services, Inc. et al

Defendant: AMG Capital Management, LLC, AMG Services, Inc., Black Creek Capital Corporation, Don E. Brady, Broadmoor Capital Partners, LLC, Robert D. Campbell, LeadFlash Consulting, LLC, Level 5 Motorsports, LLC, Troy L. LittleAxe, Timothy J. Muir, Park 269 LLC, Partner Weekly, LLC, Red Cedar Services, Inc., SFS, Inc., The Muir Law Firm, LLC, Tribal Financial Services, Blaine A. Tucker, Kim C. Tucker and Scott A. Tucker
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Case Number: 2:2012cv00536
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2016 1036 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1031 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions Emergency Motion To Enforce Asset Freeze Order is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 24, 2016 1035 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1028 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. The FTC shall file a response re 1029 Motion to Modify Asset Freeze on or before 8/26/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2016 1030 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1018 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. FTC's Motion for an Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 974 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the twenty-two entities listed in this order are within the scope of the Court's Asset Freeze Order (ECF No. 960 ). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 29, 2016 1027 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1022 Motion to Withdraw Ryan C Hudson as Counsel of Record for defendants AMG Capital Management, LLC; Level 5 Motorsports, LLC; LeadFlash Consulting LLC; Black Creek Capital Corporation; Broadmoor Capital Partners; Scott A. Tucker; and Nereyda M. Tucker, as Executor of the Estate of Blaine A. Tucker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2016 1024 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1020 Motion to Compel. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 7, 2016 1014 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 985 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Seal is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to unseal ECF No. 984 and all of its Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 6, 2016 1010 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1009 Motion for an Order Authorizing Credit Report as to Defendant Scott Tucker is GRANTED. ORDERED that pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1681b(a)(1), a credit report shall be issued for the Defendant Scott Alan Tucker. FURTHER ORDERE D that the credit report for Defendant Tucker shall be provided to the Federal Trade Commission, with a copy to counsel for Defendant Tucker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 26, 2016 1001 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a telephonic status hearing re 1000 Motion for Clarification Regarding Order Setting June 9, 2016 Hearing is scheduled for 5/31/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 25, 2016 999 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 985 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that relief defendants must file a response showing cause, by June 3, 2016, why Exhibit 22 (ECF No. 984-25) and the portions of the FTC's memorandum discussing that Exhibit should remain sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 12, 2016 995 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 994 Tucker Defendants' Motion for Clarification is GRANTED. The Tucker Defendants' reply in support of their evidentiary objections (ECF NO. 957 ) is accepted for filing without further action by the Tucker Defendants. FTC is permitted to file a sur-reply not to exceed 10 pages to ECF No. 957 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 9, 2016 993 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 959 Motion to Strike 943 Objection to Document. The Tucker Defendants may file their objections (ECF NO. 943) and FTC may file a sur-reply not to exceed 10 pages to ECF NO. 943. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 4, 2016 986 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 951 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 3, 2016 982 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 981 Motion to Extend Briefing re 974 Motion for Order to Show Cause and 975 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Responding memoranda shall be filed by May 3, 2016, and reply memoranda shall be filed by May 9, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 14, 2016 967 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 966 Motion to Withdraw LaShawn M Johnson as Counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 5, 2016 962 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 932 the Tucker Defendants' Motion to Stay the Case is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 31, 2016 960 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 786 the Tucker Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and 792 the Relief Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 808 the Tucker Defendants' Motion to Reconsider is DENIED . FURTHER ORDERED that 810 FTC's Motion to Unseal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk is ordered to UNSEAL the following documents: Declaration of Natalie C. Dempsey (ECF No. 803-8); OneClickCash Traning Manual (ECF No. 803-9 ); and UCL Team Meeting Minutes (ECF No. 803-10). Blaine Tucker's Living Trust (ECF No. 803-7) will remain filed under SEAL. FURTHER ORDERED that 780 FTC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED pursuant to the terms listed in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2016 956 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 899 Motion for Discovery Sanctions is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the FTC's disgorgement damages are limited to $26.7 million; $8 million of which is attributable to the purchase and maintenance of property in Aspen, C O, with the remaining $18,714,603.10 attributable to payment from the Defendants for which the Relief Defendants offered no consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 22, 2016 955 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDERED that plaintiff may file on or before March 30, 2016, a sur-reply in opposition to the Motion to Stay which addresses only those arguments in the Tucker Defendants' reply based on the letter to Judge Hall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 22, 2016 934 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 926 Emergency Motion for an Expedited Briefing Schedule is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 933 Motion for Leave to File Surreply is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 12, 2016 929 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 926 Motion to Expedite. Replies due by 2/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 10, 2016 925 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 910 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to seal Exhibit 190 (# 909 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 4, 2016 920 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 918 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal Dkt. 508-11, Exhibit CC to the Supplemental Declaration of Natalie Dempsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 3, 2016 919 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 915 Motion to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re 899 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery and 900 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/26/2016. Replies due by 3/18/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 15, 2015 898 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 891 Motion to Unseal is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to UNSEAL the following document as originally filed: Doc. # 852 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 9, 2015 897 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 894 Motion to Extend Time and 896 Joint Motion for Leave to File are GRANTED; 890 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave is DENIED as moot. Motions due by 1/20/2016. Responses due by 2/26/2016. Replies due by 3/18/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 25, 2015 889 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER for PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to defendant SFS, Inc. JUDGMENT in the amount of $2,200,000.00 in favor of Federal Trade Commission against SFS, Inc. as equitable monetary relief. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 27, 2015 866 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Hearing re 864 Motion to Enforce the August 28 Order for the FTC to Produce a Privilege Log is scheduled for 11/2/2015 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 8, 2015 862 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 859 Stipulation to Stay Case as to SFS, Inc. and Red Cedar Services, Inc. is granted until November 6, 2015, and a proposed stipulated order for permanent injunctive relief or, alternatively, a joint status report is due on November 6, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 22, 2015 853 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 851 AFR's Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 28, 2015 849 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 735 Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Compel is GRANTED in full. FURTHER ORDERED that 769 Federal Trade Commission's Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 777 Tucker D efendants' Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 788 Tucker Defendants' Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 17, 2015 848 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 847 Motion for Exception to Attendance Requirement for 9/22/15 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 12, 2015 842 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full 834 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 4, 2015 838 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 837 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the 8/14/15 Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 20, 2015 832 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 828 Motion to Extend Time to File Sealed Motion to Unseal is GRANTED. Motion due by 9/21/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 7, 2015 826 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 825 Joint Motion for Clarification is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 17, 2015 820 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., Monday, July 20, 2015, in courtroom 3D. Counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for all Defendants, who have not yet reached a settlement with Plaintiff, must attend the status hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 15, 2015 817 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 785 Motion to Unseal is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that redacted copies of Exhibits 2, 10, 22, 59, 60, 61, 63, and 101 be filed by June 29, 2015. FURTHER ORDERED that Exhibit 102 (#781-108) remain sealed until the court orders otherwise . FURTHER ORDERED that 790 Motion to Unseal is GRANTED. Documents #789-1, 789-2, and 789-3 are UNSEALED. FURTHER ORDERED that 800 Motion for Leave to Seal is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Tucker Defendants' memorandum in support of their Motion for Leave to Seal 801 is UNSEALED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 11, 2015 815 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 814 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Victoria W. Ni substituted in place and stead of Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Belton for Americans for Financial Reform.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 4, 2015 805 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 801 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Tucker Defendants redact the first five digits of the social- security number appearing on page 9 of Exhibit 9 (Doc. # 797 -10) and refile the redacted exhibit by June 8, 2015. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SEAL page 9 of Exhibit 9 (Doc. # 797 -10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 13, 2015 784 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 783 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 777 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Replies due by 5/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 7, 2015 773 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 772 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for the Relief Defendants to Serve their Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2015 771 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 741 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED that 746 Motion to Stay is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 23, 2015 768 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 734 Motion to Seal its Protective Order; denying 750 Motion to Seal its Reply; denying 745 Motion to Seal its Motion to Stay; granting 744 Motion to Unseal its Opposition; denying 737 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to it s Motion to Compel under Seal; denying 740 Motion for an Expedited Briefing Scheduling; and denying 758 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties MEET & CONFER before filing any additional motions to seal in this mat ter. A motion to seal must include a certification that the movant has in good faith conferred or attempted to confer with the person or party opposing sealing. A partys failure to certify compliance with this meet-and-confer requirement will constitute a consent to the denial of a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 17, 2015 764 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 752 Motion to Admit Government Attorney to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment. Attorney Thomas E. Kane for Federal Trade Commission added. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 17, 2015 730 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 724 Motion to Amend the Pleadings and 725 Motion to Amend 645 Answer are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2015 727 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER Granting 723 Motion for Permanent Injunction and Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 21, 2015 726 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 635 Motion for Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. (E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 14, 2015 722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 691 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 703 Counter Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that the Relief Defendants' request for oral argumen t is DENIED. See LR 78-2. FURTHER ORDERED that 708 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 694 Notice of Corrected Image is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 12, 2015 720 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 693 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Compel Exhibits Under Seal re 691 MOTION to Compel . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 9, 2015 719 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 717 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 13, 2014 704 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 668 Americans for Financial Reform's Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 669 Americans for Financial Reform's Motion to Unseal is DENIED as not ripe for Review. FURTHER ORDERED that Americans for Financial R eform must COMPLY with the court's existing protective orders and must not distribute the sealed documents or their contents to the public. FURTHER ORDERED that only Counsel admitted to practice in this action for AFR and NO OTHER PERSON OR ENTI TY whether or not acting on or behalf of, or affiliated with, AFR may view the court's sealed filings in this matter. FURTHER ORDERED that Americans for Financial Reform must file a Sealed Motion to Unseal by January 12, 2015, after complying with Local Rule 26-7(b). FURTHER ORDERED that Americans for Financial Reform's request for an oral argument is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 27, 2014 696 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 684 Stipulation to Stay Case as to Troy Littleaxe, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 8, 2014 671 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 667 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Timothy J. Muir and Muir Law Firm, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/8/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 25, 2014 661 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 654 Motion to Stay Case as to Timothy J. Muir and the Muir Law Firm, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 28, 2014 632 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that 617 MOTION for Protective Order is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 618 MOTION to Strike is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 624 MOTION to Quash is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 626 MOTION to Quash is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 627 MOTION to Amend is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 18, 2014 630 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 617 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED as moot; that 618 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot; that 624 Motion to Quash is DENIED as moot; that 626 Motion to Quash is DENIED as moot; that 627 Motion to Amend Motion for a Protective Order is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 16, 2014 629 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that Defendants' Objections 544 , 543 , are DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that Relief Defendants' Motion to Strike 588 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Phase II of this litigation shall commence on the date of this Order. Defe ndants shall have twenty-one days from the date of this Order to file an answer to the First Amended Complaint 386 . The parties shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to file a joint submission that offers a proposed Discovery Plan an d Scheduling Order for Phase II of the litigation, as defined by the Bifurcation Agreement.FURTHER ORDERED that the Tucker Defendants' Motion to Reconsider 589 , Defendant Campbell's Motion to Amend 591 , the Lending Defendants' M otion to Resolve Dispute 593 , the Muir Defendants' Motion to Amend 594 , the Lending Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline 601 , the Tucker Defendants' Motions for Dispute Resolution 602 , 603 , Defendant LittleAxe's Motion to Resolve Dispute 622 , and the parties' Joint Motion for a Hearing 625 are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 17, 2014 599 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 586 Motion to Substitute Party. Nereyda M. Tucker, executor of the estate of Blaine A. Tucker, is SUBSTITUTED for Defendant Blaine A. Tucker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 28, 2014 584 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Adopting 539 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that 454 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 461 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED th at the Bifurcation Order is amended to permit Count II and Count IV to proceed against the Muir Defendants during Phase II of the litigation. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 15, 2014 576 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 560 Motion to Unseal and File Redacted Memoranda and Exhibits in Connection with Summary Judgment Motions is GRANTED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 7, 2014 575 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 574 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal 573 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 04/07/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 1, 2014 572 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 570 Motion to Seal 569 Exhibits A and C-I re 568 Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 24, 2014 567 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 563 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal re 561 Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 11, 2014 562 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 558 Motion to Seal 556 and 557 Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 7, 2014 559 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full, to the extent it is not inconsistent with this opinion, 444 Report and Recommendation.FURTHER ORDERED that 338 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set f orth in Section I(1) of Judge Ferenbach's Report and Recommendation 444 .FURTHER ORDERED that 373 MOTION Legal Determination and 380 Cross-Motion for Legal Determination are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth in Section I(2) of Judge Ferenbach's Report and Recommendation 444 . Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 28, 2014 540 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 459 Motion to Compel is DENIED as Unripe. FURTHER ORDERED that 501 Motion to Enforce the Permanent Injunction and Judgment is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 522 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 13, 2014 536 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 534 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 536 replaced on 1/13/2014) (MMM).
December 31, 2013 530 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 513 Motion to Seal 512 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 26, 2013 525 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 516 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal 514 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 23, 2013 521 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 509 Motion to Seal Supplemental Declaration in Support of Defendants Opposition to the FTCs Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 5, 2013 506 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 492 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Summary Judgment Opposition Memorandum and Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 5, 2013 488 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 486 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 22, 2013 483 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 481 Agreed Motion for Amended Expert Deposition and Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition to 459 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony is due by 10/29/2013. FTC's Reply is due 11/6/13. Expert discovery , including the deposition of Defendants' expert witness, must be completed on or before 11/20/13. All parties' oppositions to dispositive motions, including 454 and 461 Motions for Summary Judgment due 12/3/13. Replies due 12/20/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 8, 2013 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 446 Joint Motion for Permanent Injunction and Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 1, 2013 474 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 464 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 17, 2013 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 443 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney Courtney A. Estep. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 24, 2013 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 343 Federal Trade Commission's Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before May 24, 2013, the defendants must file under SEAL a list of the consumers who took out payday l oans from the named defendants after the date of their declaration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 345 AMG's Motion to Compel is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that AMGs objections to the privileges are OVERRULED and AMGs request for an in camera review is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 360 AMG's Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED in PART. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, on or before June 6, 2013, FTC must provide AMG with the bank records redacted to reveal tra nsactions relating to any payday loan only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 419 AMG's Motion for Partial Withdraw of AMG's Second Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 22, 2013 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 423 Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule re 421 MOTION for Protective Order . Responses due by 5/31/2013. Replies due by 6/7/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 6, 2013 411 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 388 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that 334 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)(1) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 23, 2013 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 393 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney LaShawn M. Johnson as to Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 16, 2013 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a hearing re 343 FTC's Motion for Protective Order and 345 AMG's Motion to Compel FTC's Production of a Privilege Log and Accompanying Affidavit is set for 5/20/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before 4/29/13, the FTC must provide the court and AMG with the privilege log for responsive documents withheld as privileged. On or before 5/6/13, AMG may file a supplement to its motion to compel 345 . Any reply is due on or before 5/13/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 11, 2013 385 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 340 Motion to Unseal Exhibits 14, 17, 20, and 23 in 328 SEALED MOTION to Seal 327 Memorandum, 326 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 10, 2013 384 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 349 Motion to Amend Complaint. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 4/15/13, the FTC must file and serve amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 4, 2013 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 363 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 19, 2013 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 328 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits re 326 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 24, 2013 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 320 Unopposed Motion Regarding Filing of Answer. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 4, 2013 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 301 Unopposed Motion to File Redacted Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Out of Time and to Redact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 27, 2012 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 293 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Bifurcation. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 14, 2012 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 257 Joint Motion to Unseal and File Redacted Memoranda and Exhibits in Connection with 4 Preliminary Injunction Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/14/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 13, 2012 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 281 Notice of Withdrawal of 242 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 30, 2012 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 264 First Unnopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule re 236 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Tucker Defendants and 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Opening brief due by 12/10/2012. Responses due by 12/28/2012. R eplies due by 1/14/2013. Sur-Replies due by 1/28/2013 re 4 Preliminary Injuction. Responses due by 12/7/2012. Replies due by 12/14/2012 re 236 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 28, 2012 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition currently noticed by Defendant Troy L. LittleAxe for 12/13/2012, at 9:00 a.m. is STAYED until further order from the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Opposition to the 236 Motion to Compel , 240 Motion to Compel, 241 Motion to Compel and 253 Emergency Motion for Protective Order are due on 11/30/2012. That Plaintiff's Replies to its Motions to Compel ( 236 , 240 , 241 , and 242 ) and 253 Emergency Motion for Protective Order are due on 12/10/2012. Defendant LittleAxes Response to the Plaintiff's 259 Emergency Motion For Protective Order is due on 12/05/2012. Plaintiff's Reply is due on 12/12/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2012 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 26, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition currently noticed for December 4, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. is STAYED until further order from the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Responses to the 236 Motion to Compel, 240 Motion to Compel, 241 Motion to Co mpel and 253 Motion for Protective Order are due 11/30/2012. The FTC's Replies in support of its Motions to Compel ( 236 , 240 , 241 , and 242 ) and 253 Motion for Protective Order are due 12/10/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2012 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 14, 2012 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 243 Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court Clerk is directed to seal attachment 23 filed in docket number 243 , to Plaintiffs 242 Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/14/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 15, 2012 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 214 Emergency Motion to Partially Withdraw of 100 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 30(b)(6) depositions previously scheduled for October 17 and 18, 2012, are hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 12, 2012 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the remaining Rule 30(b)(6) deposition topics are amended as outlined above. FURTHER ORDERED that 207 Cross-Motion to Compel Deposition Answers and Production of Documents is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Tribal-Chartered Defendants must produce the documents listed above via electronic mail not later than October 16, 2012, 11:00 AM PDT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 11, 2012 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 203 Motion to Seal 204 Response to 188 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 1, 2012 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 188 Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order with respect to the 10/04/2012 deposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties proceed with the 10/04/2012 9:00 am Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Def endant SFS, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the FTC file an opposition to 188 Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order, with respect to the October 17th and 18th depositions. Responses due by 10/10/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2012 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/01/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 11, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 160 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney as to Ioana Rusu. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 09/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 28, 2012 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 134 Motion for Protective Order. The temporary stay of discovery is lifted as to all defendants, except as noted below. Responses to all pending discovery requests are due 09/28/2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Law Firms 136 De fendants' request to quash subpoena is DENIED. The temporary stay is continued with regard to the Commerce Bank Subpoena with exception of bank records. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that FTC must file a notice identifying 2 accounts of Mr. Singhvi by 0 9/04/2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 138 , 139 , and 142 Motions to Quash are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties must file a stipulated confidentiality and protective order on or before 09/11/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 08/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 15, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 122 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Troy Littleaxe's Joinder. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 08/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 3, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Discovery in this matter is temporarily STAYED until further order from the Court. Brief due by 8/13/2012. Reply brief due by 8/20/2012. Discovery Hearing set for 8/23/2012 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 08/03/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 4, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 97 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Attorney for Helen Wong for Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 31, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Replies due by 6/7/2012 re 71 MOTION to Seal Exhibits filed by The Muir Law Firm, LLC, Timothy J. Muir and 68 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Victoria ML Budich filed by The Muir Law Firm, LLC, Timothy J. Muir. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/31/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
April 25, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. AMG Capital Management, LLC answer due 5/25/2012; AMG Services, Inc. answer due 5/25/2012; Black Creek Capital Corporation answer due 5/25/2012; Don E. Brady answer due 5/25/2012; Broadmoor Capital Partners, LLC answer due 5/25/2012; Robert D. Campbell answer due 5/25/2012; LeadFlash Consulting, LLC answer due 5/25/2012; Level 5 Motorsports, LLC answer due 5/25/2012; Ti mothy J. Muir answer due 5/25/2012; Park 269 LLC answer due 5/25/2012; Partner Weekly, LLC answer due 5/25/2012; Red Cedar Services, Inc. answer due 5/25/2012; SFS, Inc. answer due 5/25/2012; The Muir Law Firm, LLC answer due 5/25/2012; Tribal Financ ial Services answer due 5/25/2012; Blaine A. Tucker answer due 5/25/2012; Kim C. Tucker answer due 5/25/2012; Scott A. Tucker answer due 5/25/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/25/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 17, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 31 Joinder to 12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 5/4/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 16, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 19 Joinder to Extension of Time to File Response to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kim C. Tucker and Park 269 LLC. Responses due by 5/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 4, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Attorney as to Nikhil Singhvi, Julie Bush, and Jason Schall. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. AMG Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Von S. Heinz
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG Services, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Creek Capital Corporation
Represented By: Von S. Heinz
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don E. Brady
Represented By: Nathan F. Garrett
Represented By: Brian R. Reeve
Represented By: Whitney P Strack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadmoor Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Von S. Heinz
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Campbell
Represented By: Jay Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeadFlash Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Von S. Heinz
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level 5 Motorsports, LLC
Represented By: Von S. Heinz
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy L. LittleAxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Muir
Represented By: L. Chrisopher Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park 269 LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partner Weekly, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Cedar Services, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFS, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Muir Law Firm, LLC
Represented By: L. Chrisopher Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribal Financial Services
Represented By: David J. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine A. Tucker
Represented By: Von S. Heinz
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim C. Tucker
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. Tucker
Represented By: Von S. Heinz
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Julie G Bush
Represented By: Jason Schall
Represented By: Nikhil Singhvi
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?